Translator: Andrea McDonough

Reviewer: Bedirhan Cinar Nameste. I’m from India, and India is one of the oldest civilizations in the world. It has contributed to the world concepts such as yoga, ayurveda, spicy chicken tikka, and Vedic math. Vedic math is one of the world’s easiest and simplest way to do math. We are going to combine together and do some number crunching today. So what we are going to first do is multiply by 11. We’re going to do it together, so if you blink, you’re going to miss it. So just watch it, OK. So we’re going to do 32 times 11, OK. So we split 3, and we split 2, and we add 3 and 2 and paste it on top, and we get the answer as 352. That’s it. Let’s try another sum. 45 times 11. Let’s hear it. Exactly, that’s 495. And 75 times 11. So it gives you 7,125, 1 gets carried over and it becomes 825. That’s how simple it is. OK, this is the principle behind it where a is the coefficient. Let’s move on. OK, now what we’re going to do is the base method. OK, this is used to multiply numbers very close to the powers of 10, like 10, 100, 1,000, and so on. So we have a sum here, say 99 times 97. OK, now tell me, is 99 more than 100 or less than 100? Less by how much? So we write minus 01. And 97 is less than 100 by how much? So we write minus 03. So what we’re going to do is we’re going to cross subtract and get the first part of the answer, like this. We’re going to do cross subtraction. 97 minus 01 would give us 96. and we multiply 03 times 01 vertically, and we get an answer of 03. Let’s check another sum. Try and do it yourselves. We got 98, which is, is it more than a 100, less than 100? By how much? And 97 is 3. So we got 98, we go crosswise, we got 98 minus 3, or we can do 97 minus 2, they’ll all give you the same answer. So that would give us 95. And the second part would be 06. So that’s our answer. OK, let’s take a bigger number. Let’s try this one. Here the base is 1,000. So we got -004, and 997 would be -003. We go crosswise like this, and we get 996 minus 003 would give us 993, and 004 times 003 would give us 012. And that’s our answer. Thank you. 14 times 12. OK, here the base is 10. OK, so is 14 more than 10 or less than 10? More, so we got plus 4, and 12, we got plus 2. Again, we apply the same rule, so we do 12 plus 4, which gives us 16, like this. And we multiply 2 and 4, that gives us 8. So now, all of us here, we’re going to do mental squaring, OK. Everybody is going to participate here, and we’re going to do squares of numbers more than 100 mentally right now. So we got 101, OK, now visualize on the board, what’s going to be on the right hand side. Plus 01, so we got that. OK, now we add plus sides, right? Yes? No? So we got 101 plus 01, that would give us 102, and, see here, like this. And 01 is getting squared, right? So that would give us 01, and that’s your answer. Try the next one. Let’s try 102 squared. Let’s try, everybody. So 100, so 102 would be 10404. OK, now the next one, try it everybody together. I’ll give you 5 seconds. OK, let’s say it together, let’s say it together, OK. [10609] 10609 and that’s the answer. Woo! 104 squared, how much would that be? Calculate it, 5 seconds. Come on, girls in the back. OK, so the answer would be 10816. OK, let’s do the next one: 105 squared. Oh, no, no, no, no, we’re going to try over, we’re going to try over, OK? OK. I’ll give you 5 seconds, just think about it. OK, now we’re going to go, OK? 11025. OK, let’s going to do the next one, 106 squared. Try it, come one, everybody, it’s simple and easy. [11236] OK, let’s do it one more time. 11236. Now 107, think, hold on, don’t say anything out loud, just think mentally, 107 squared. OK, now let’s say it out loud. 11449. And 108 squared. [11664] Fantastic, give yourself a round of applause, come on! And this is the principle behind this, where a and b are the excesses or the deficiency from the base. I’m going to teach you in Vedic math, there are 16 sutras, or word formulas, OK. They are very visual and one of them is called, “vertically and crosswise,” through which you can multiply any number by any number in a single line. So I’m going to do a two-digit by a two-digit multiplication. Let’s do this. So we got 31 times 12. OK, so we’re going to apply the vertically and crosswise sutra. So we’re going to do like this: vertically, and then we’re going to go crosswise, and then we’re going to do vertical again. So, 2 times 1 gives us [2], 2 times 3 gives us [6], and 1 times 1 gives us [1]. 6 plus 1, [7]. 1 times 3 gives us [3]. And that’s it, and that’s our answer. No more tedious calculations, no more going through the rough work, it’s simple in one line. I want to show you a sum again, this time with carry-overs. The same formula, all of us here can do this, OK. Same formula. So let’s get started. 4 times 2 gives us [8]. OK, now we go crosswise like this, so we’re going to multiply 4 times 1, [4], and 3 times 2, [6] 4 plus 6 gives us [10]. So we put down 0, carry the 1. And 3 times 1 gives us [3], plus 1, [4]. Exactly, that’s our answer, 408. OK, thank you for being such a participative audience, and we had a great time number crunching. Now I want to end with a question: whether you’d like math to be dull or boring, or fun and interesting? The choice is yours.

wow

🗿INDIA has Started Mathematics in whole world by Invention of Zero

What about 76×12?

77×13? , 78×14? And so on????

Best part about the Vedic maths ? You cannot teach this compulsory in every school why ? Because we are Secular country isn't it so cool to be in Secular Country 😍🥰 We don't teach this method in India because we respect all Religion .

Not important method since we have calculators

i feel like Aryabhatt.

Why are we Indians are not teaching this in our schools?????

Please don't be nationalist and try to tell your nationalist superior then others we all are human being and every civilization gave great things to humanity we must keep it continue rather then just oh country gave this and that we don't have to showoff to others we must keep it up and share knowledge and information to others who doesn't knows

不知为何，看到这个甚至有点优越感，作为一个中国人，发自内心的觉得这些太小儿科了

And then the English came and destroyed everything…. why do we even have the western method of mathematics in schools? It should be Indian…. !!!! Time to undo our mistakes

That is worth teaching in school! Love from India! 🇮🇳

Sir plz tell me in base 10 or 100 method where we have to put zero..where not to put..like in 98*96 ..we put -02 nd -04 and in 14*12 we just put 4 And 2..is there a

This is basic arithmetic. Which can be easily calculated by a calculator.

Don't call it mathematics.

Why do we pronounce 'ayurved' as ayurveda, 'Yog' as Yoga, 'Ganga' as Ganges ….. Just because of 'visarga'!?

To take pride, we ought to shun the colonial hangover.

https://youtu.be/XMriWTvPXHI

Teach mathematics, formulating is a skill. Any myth or lie waters good. Learn why truth is beautiful everywhere.

arey o vedic math walo mujhsey milo fir engineering main bharatiya kahaniyon ko jodekar dekhna hain

India me kiyo nehi vedic math sikhate? ??I feel so sad😭😭

Very basic Vedic maths

There is no such thing called Vedic maths

No maths in veda

In fact quantum mathematics was invented recently, sometime in 2045 AD, by brahmins. And it is only 2019.

Einstein stole the General theory of relativity from Vedic scriptures and special theory of relativity too. It is so sad that we brahmins allowed non-brahmins to steal our 3trillion years old technology and have ended up as secondary citizens in India.

Algebra was discovered by Persian scientist Kharazmi.

I curse my math teachers for not teaching me this 😀

Yes that's why Indian GDP is not growing but population.

I've been doing this maths since i started school i just didn't know it's called vedic maths since in Africa we use a different language

gaurav tekriwal

Should we go back to vedik age ? If yes , first change your dress.No trouser , no shirt , no coat , no specs no shoes .No englsh , only sanskrit.

Do you have documentary proof ? Can you establish with those evidence that these short cut methods were exclusively Indian methods during vedic age ?

'THE MAN WHO KNEW INFINITY' WAS FROM INDIA .

ASTRONOMY(past and future calculations of stars And humans)IS ALL MATHS AND FOUND SPECIALIST FROM INDIA.

I'm from Pakistan but before 1947 I was from India 👇😍

Remember we had a workshop like this in school

Cow 🐄 maths

These are shortcut tricks and are of no use.

There is no “and” in whole numbers. And means “decimal point” when saying a number.

Sir, in English it is MATHS not math.

this is not vedic math its vedic gadit written by swami vivekanand…

Proud to be Indian, Jai hind

which veda contains these sutras?

Vedic math should be back in India.

What do you mean math or whatever it is magic. Methinks more like torment!

One thing the world ignores and forgets about India is Vegetarianism, when foreigners come to India they should be tasting Vegetarian food as India is the only Vegetarian majority country on earth, but even they search for Chiken tikka and chiken butter masala when they visit india😢

Ok I understood the methods, but give me 5 minutes to solve one..😥

Indians🇮🇳 are Masters of making things Easy.

We found various ways to make calculations easy,

Similarly, lord krishna himself told Bhagvat gita to make Life Easy and it applies on everyone..

.

But due to sickularim and minority appeasement, We are not taught Bhagvat gita in our school. Come on people it's not a religious book, neither does it spray venom against others.

Today Indians would have been better humans if we had read It😢😢

After all the damage that British And Islam did to India, India will rise again🇮🇳🇮🇳

Vedic math? liar. which veda books says theas2?

Ooooo, my grandpa Jack taught me this. Now, I know the origin. I can not recall my Indian friends and relatives even sharing this playful trick with number. Cool.

So simple, yet so powerful !

I loved this video.

Amazing!

Is there anyone who still think '0' wasn't invented in India during Vedic period ?!….

God bless Aryabhatta

After hiding Vedas for ages, this is being revealed to public now to show it's greatness. AFTER general public has learnt all this, and more from Europeans. Impressive. But what's the point?

The Credit goes to Aryabhatta ( The great Indian Mathematician)

Bharat 🇮🇳 is the mother of all civilisations.

Hinduism is the mother of all religions.

Sanskrit is the mother of all languages.

"MERA BHARAT MAHAN"🇮🇳🚩🕉🙏

Feeling great to be an indian

Because of illegals?

It's definitely offensive to subtitle somebody in English, when they are talking in English.

There was an Indian math "trick" I learned 20 years ago, using a grid to multiply larger numbers (like 4 and 5 digit). It used the grid and simple addition to multiply the numbers. I cannot remember it exactly, and google has not been my friend. Anyone know it?

Did you know that all of the principles of mathematics spun into existence without any intelligent mind guiding them? See how foolish that sounds?

Even math declares the glory and brilliance of the Creator.

This is really cool math. I still love learning new things. Incredible, really…

Hinduism was about science and open minded philosophy to begin with. Thats why I believe that in the 21st century, hindu organisations should voluntarily move away from politics and start investing on science that furthers morally correct and peaceful existance. For example, hindu temples could use their funds and assets on promoting environmental sustainability, wild life protection or commercial production of lab grown meat. How about investing on psychology and mental health?

These are the things of future, and if hinduism is to lead humans into an enlightened existance, it must be proactive. Leave politics for politicians and technocrats. Invest on science for an enlightened future.

Nothing Vedic in vedic mathematics : The Hindu

https://www.thehindu.com/opinion/op-ed/nothing-vedic-in-vedic-maths/article6373689.ece

○ http://www.math.tifr.res.in/~dani/vmtimeart.pdf

Blessed to be born in such a great country.Cursed to be led by such thugs and cheats that are our present day leaders.

Great method. Terrible teacher.

Who are the fools who disliked this video?

Starting a new channel here: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=oKnVhgcOqCE&t=17s

Why don't you use a calculator?

Proud to be an indian

No chicken

"Namaste"

"I'm from India"

Confusion NoisesThank you sir… you have explained it in easy way

It’s all about tricks not Vedic maths

See Greeks innovate Great Tricks they Became Vedic math. Math tricks are there with Every civilisation like Egypt Greek Indus Persian Chinese it will Achieve through Research and Development.

Western achievement of Calculator is also Great tools for maths

Chaturahat barg samuh pakshyy dwayam gunyet abyakt barg purna pakshyy tatoh mulam.

Yojnanam sahastra dwe dwe shate dwe cha yojne aken nimishdharnen krammana namostute.

Yatha sikha mayuranam naganan manyo yatha tadvad vedang shastranam ganitam murdhni stitham.

Shunyamanyat

Hame garv hai apne vedic religion par

@6:14 … another way … squaring any number ending in 5, keep in mind that the result will end in 25, and to get the beginning of the answer, multiply the significant digit(s) by one more than the significant digit(s). Complicated numbers might actually be easier to multiply the Vedic method. @8:00 … still RTL? No, no, no… this is done easier LTR (as you were doing in the first part of the video) and you can say the answer as it's being done in your head. Too bad you didn't have enough time to show 3-digit+ numbers. I love it with the light bulb goes off in people's heads. 🙂

That is why I love india.There are many instances when Indians invented things we use in daily life and did not filed for patent and other people took our invention ideas that is why India is best

I recommend using a calculator instead. Totally impractical in the current scenario.

This is fun to watch, but to brush aside the actual principles behind these "tricks" is like taking the math out of math… Also, there is no evidence that these tricks come from the ancient Vedas, as the name "Vedic math" would imply.

the multiples is not always give correct answer .

in this video you show 14*12=168, but it's failed when we do 17*18 then this mathod do not solve the problems

I know vedic mathematics more than you.

Mere maths teacher ND se pdate the (nandlal dayaram )

India is doing a disservice by not teaching these techniques to Indian children. But then again this in India we are talking about , a country that does everything in it's power to end up a failure.

Is there a book on Vedic Maths, better late than never, They never taught this in our schools in India, granted I finished school in 2003. But Goddam it India, why did you betray us by not teaching us this. Also I heard India is big on using Vedic math to design it's super computers. Good for us.

If indian mathematics is so advanced then why we Indians don't implement vedic maths in indian schools??

It's because we indians still think that other's are superior than us, we are still their slave's in our mind, whether it is in language or mathematics or in any field..

1. Vedic maths has nothing to do with the vedas. Look it up.

2. What this guy presented here is not mathematics. It is calculation. These are some shortcuts for making some kinds of calculations easier. Yes, it is cool but nothing incredible.

3. There are no new mathematical principles or concepts involved.

If you want to argue, find a real mathematician.

Why can’t we learn using calculator ?

I guess some Americans/Europeans may have already patented these shortcut tricks as if like their own findings, whereas Vedic Maths is existed for more than 2000 years as free knowledge to everyone.

If math was comedy,, the stuff in this video would be in the realm of dad jokes ..

These mathod are using in our competitive examinations..(.Indian)

Which veda gives origin to this math??? Can anyone provide verse and chapter number? Why this maths was abscure before 1965??? Simple answer- this maths has no relationship with Vedas.

It’s pretty interesting but how would you multiply number that is less than the base with a number greater than the base. And can you multiply numbers that have different dismal places.

Why isn't this animated and made interesting like other videos..👍👍🙏

For people who thinking after this we school students are great at mathematics and practical and all nope its just a lie teacher only teach how to solve not how it can be used in practical life. Talking about life in india there is only 2 college which gives you life 1:- iit 2:- aiims every other colleges is just poop or bellow iitian have right to bully anyone they want because they are iitians and there nothing like practical the knowledge is in the book and the book is knowledge everything you see and try to learn is just a waste of time and not going to clear jee mains or neet exam

how do you know when you should multiply or add when you cross examine?

maths is the subject that saved me from my indian parents from getting scolding in parents teacher meetings…love ya mathematics

or you could use a calculator haha

India has simplest mathematical system, call vedic math. But western world still denied it, even in Europe vedic numerical system (0,1,2,3,4,5,6,7,8,9) banned till 19th century. They used roman numbers (I,II,III,IV,V,VI,VII,VIII,IX,X).

https://youtu.be/VmWVXOIQblM

I’ll take the spicy chicken tikka thanks

How will we know how many zeros do we have to put in the middle?

I love this man's accent. "thank you for being a patoiejralbflsjdhf awwdeeince."

9:20

🤯👏👏👏👏

Sir , I have a problem that if in they given multiplication 1st no. is less than 100 and 2nd one greater than 100 . How to solve that problem sir . Please help me sir

INDIA!!!!

Lol why some Muslims are claiming arabs inventing algebra and arithmetic 🤣

It all existed much before Islam coming to earth. Arabs came in India studied SANSKRIT and converted them in arabic and went

No. Of noble prize won by Indians alone are. more than total number of noble price won by all the Muslims nations combined

Why is he showing this to students who are Allowed to use calculators during xam